LA HB776 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
Pending: Senate Judiciary C Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
Pending: Senate Judiciary C Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to operating a vehicle while intoxicated
Title
Provides relative to operating a vehicle while intoxicated
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 776 FINAL PASSAGE (#601) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-17 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/2024. |
2024-04-16 | House | Notice given. |
2024-04-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/2024. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2024-03-26 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-03-25 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |