MA S97 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4613

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to mandated reporters. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to mandated reporters

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-19HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4613
2016-01-28JointHearing scheduled for 02/09/2016 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

H4613 (Replaced by) 2016-09-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S36 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - See H3203
S1261 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S838 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1349 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1309 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1280 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied S1311

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback