MA S1349 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to further regulate the appointment of police officers. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to municipal police officer examinations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2015-05-04JointHearing scheduled for 05/12/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1292 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1224 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1744 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1283 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S35 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1305 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1111 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2175
S2175 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1285 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1216 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1215 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1356 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback