MA S1216 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2199

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-15 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the practice of athletic training. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the practice of athletic training

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-15SenateCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2016-06-13SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2016-06-13SenateReported from the committee on Senate Rules from a part of S2199
2016-03-28SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2199
2015-11-09JointHearing scheduled for 11/17/2015 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S2199 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S1231
S265 (Similar To) 2015-09-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2013
S1832 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
H1912 (Similar To) 2016-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4686
S161 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S1795 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S1367 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1280 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied S1311
S66 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2306
S797 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S769 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H1695 (Similar To) 2015-07-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback