MA S797 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2204

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to asset forfeiture. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding asset forfeiture

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-04SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2204
2015-09-10JointHearing scheduled for 09/16/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S2204 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S857 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H1148 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S931 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S803 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S806 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S730 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3352 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - See H3183

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback