MA S1224 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2199

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to post nail polish warning notices in manicure shops. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the posting of nail polish warning notices in manicure shops

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-28SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2199
2015-11-09JointHearing scheduled for 11/17/2015 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S2199 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S1231
S101 (Similar To) 2015-10-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1720 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S634 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S104 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2257
S336 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2289

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback