MA S1283 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide for HIV testing for at risk police officers. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for HIV testing for at risk police officers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-07SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2016-01-28JointHearing scheduled for 02/04/2016 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S1216 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1148 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1349 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1744 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S35 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1305 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1111 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2175
S2175 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1292 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1285 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1215 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1582 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback