MA S1582 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2290
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to dedicate a portion of the stabilization fund to cities and towns. Revenue.
Title
Dedicating a portion of the stabilization fund to cities and towns
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D] | Sen. Viriato deMacedo [R] | Sen. Robert Hedlund [R] |
Sen. Donald Humason [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2290 |
2016-02-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/23/2016 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2290 (Replaced by) 2016-05-12 - Reported in part by S1494
S1525 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1426 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1089 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Accompanied H1831
S1064 (Similar To) 2016-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 151 of the Acts of 2016
S1098 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S1097 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S1992 (Similar To) 2016-01-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1525 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1426 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1089 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Accompanied H1831
S1064 (Similar To) 2016-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 151 of the Acts of 2016
S1098 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S1097 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S1992 (Similar To) 2016-01-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1582 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1582.pdf |