MA S1148 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2356

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to maternity patient rights. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to maternity patient rights

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-23SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2356
2016-03-16SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2015-11-30JointHearing scheduled for 12/08/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S2356 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1020 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S1285 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S57 (Similar To) 2015-05-11 - Placed on file
S596 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1197 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S53 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - No further action
S1570 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S731 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2278
S1388 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback