MA S53 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-03 - No further action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to corporate rights and political spending. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution relative to corporate rights and political spending

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-03JointNo further action
2017-01-03JointJoint session held and dissolved
2016-07-13JointJoint session held and recessed to Tuesday, January 3, 2017
2016-05-18JointJoint session held and recessed to Wednesday, July 13, 2016
2016-04-06JointJoint session held and recessed to Wednesday, May 18, 2016
2016-02-03JointPlaced at the end of the calendar
2016-02-03JointRead twice
2015-05-13JointJoint session held and recessed to Wednesday, October 21, 2015
2015-05-12SenateCalled for consideration in the joint session
2015-05-11HousePlaced on file
2015-04-30SenatePlaced on file
2015-04-30SenateCommittee recommended ought NOT to pass
2015-04-22JointHearing scheduled for 04/28/2015 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

S1285 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1148 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S57 (Similar To) 2015-05-11 - Placed on file
S596 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1197 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1682 (Similar To) 2016-07-26 - New draft substituted, see S2463
H121 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2034 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - New draft substituted, see S2054
S2278 (Similar To) 2016-07-11 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1570 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S731 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2278
S1388 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1489 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S774 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1233 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S671 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S764 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1692 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback