MA S1233 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2199
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish and financing a drug collection and disposal program. Public Health.
Title
Establishing and financing a drug collection and disposal program
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Wolf [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Louis Kafka [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] |
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Rep. Leah Cole [R] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2199 |
2015-11-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 and A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S2199 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S1231
S465 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
H2077 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H1940 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
S947 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H709 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4165
S465 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
H2077 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H1940 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
S947 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H709 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4165
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1233 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1233.pdf |