MA H1940 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4242
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a reporting system for drug overdoses. Public Health.
Title
Establishing a reporting system for drug overdoses
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Fennell [D] | Sen. Thomas McGee [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. Paul Tucker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4242 |
2015-11-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2015 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H4242 (Replaced by) 2016-05-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H145 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H185 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H186 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H357 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H664 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4655
H145 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H185 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H186 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H357 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H664 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4655
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1940 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1940.pdf |