MA H185 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4578

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to practitioners in the field of personal training. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To encourage well qualified practitioners in the field of personal training

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-15HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4578
2015-11-23JointHearing scheduled for 12/01/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H4578 (Replaced by) 2016-08-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H209 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
S950 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1299 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
H1827 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
S1611 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S2210 (Similar To) -

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback