MA H186 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4578
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to regulating secondhand dealers. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to secondhand dealers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4578 |
2015-09-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4578 (Replaced by) 2016-08-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H145 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H185 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H357 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H664 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4655
H665 (Similar To) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
H145 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H185 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H357 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H664 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4655
H665 (Similar To) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H186 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H186.pdf |