MA H665 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4668
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing more efficient wetlands. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Providing for more efficient wetlands
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4668 |
2015-10-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/06/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in DCR Quabbin Bluemeadow Conference Center |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4668 (Replaced by) 2016-10-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H145 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H185 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H186 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H357 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H664 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4655
H145 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H185 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H186 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H357 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H664 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4655
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H665 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H665.pdf |