MA H4668 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on October 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Water
Title
Water
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-03 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2016-10-03 | House | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
2016-10-03 | House | Accompanied by H656, H665, H668, H735, H757 and H3410 |
2016-10-03 | House | Reported from the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H656 (Replaces) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
H665 (Replaces) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
H668 (Replaces) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
H735 (Replaces) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
H757 (Replaces) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
H3410 (Replaces) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
S1955 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - New draft substituted, see S2515
S1956 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - Enacted
H3689 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3766 (Similar To) 2015-09-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3821 (Similar To) 2016-02-24 - New draft substituted, see H4023
H665 (Replaces) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
H668 (Replaces) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
H735 (Replaces) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
H757 (Replaces) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
H3410 (Replaces) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
S1955 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - New draft substituted, see S2515
S1956 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - Enacted
H3689 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3766 (Similar To) 2015-09-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3821 (Similar To) 2016-02-24 - New draft substituted, see H4023
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4668 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4668.pdf |