MA H121 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Provost of Somerville, a petition of Denise Provost and others for the inclusion of individuals with disabilities within civil rights protections and nondiscrimination protections. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Affirming inclusion of individuals with disabilities within civil rights protections and nondiscrimination provisions in the Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-07-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-07-10 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2015-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H144 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2065
S80 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S106 (Similar To) 2015-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H126 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H127 (Similar To) 2015-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S51 (Similar To) 2015-05-11 - Placed on file
S608 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Accompanied H2048
S2116 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2361
H1610 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S80 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S106 (Similar To) 2015-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H126 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H127 (Similar To) 2015-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S51 (Similar To) 2015-05-11 - Placed on file
S608 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Accompanied H2048
S2116 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2361
H1610 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H121 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H121.pdf |