MA S2034 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S962
Note: Legislation replaced by S2054
Note: Legislation replaced by S2054
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on October 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - New draft substituted, see S2054
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - New draft substituted, see S2054
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to employees social media privacy protection,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2034).
Title
Relative to social media privacy protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-18 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2054 |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Read second |
2015-11-12 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, November 18, 2015 |
2015-11-12 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2015-11-12 | Senate | Committee recommend ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2054 |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-10-19 | Senate | New draft of S962 |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S962 (Replaces) 2015-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2034
S2054 (Replaced by) 2015-11-18 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #203 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0]
S2118 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Message read and placed on file
H1707 (Similar To) 2015-10-15 - Accompanied S968
S852 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S2054 (Replaced by) 2015-11-18 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #203 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0]
S2118 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Message read and placed on file
H1707 (Similar To) 2015-10-15 - Accompanied S968
S852 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2034 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2034.pdf |