MA S731 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2278

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2278
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to protect the rights of probationers in drug courts. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting the rights of probationers in drug courts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-05SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2278
2016-03-16HouseHouse concurred
2016-03-16SenateReporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2016, pending concurrence
2015-10-07JointHearing scheduled for 10/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S2278 (Replaced by) 2016-07-11 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S628 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1285 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1148 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S57 (Similar To) 2015-05-11 - Placed on file
S596 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback