MA S57 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Placed on file
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the subject matter of initiative petitions. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution relative to the subject matter of initiative petitions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-11HousePlaced on file
2015-04-30SenatePlaced on file
2015-04-30SenateCommittee recommended ought NOT to pass
2015-04-17JointHearing scheduled for 04/22/2015 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S12 (Similar To) 2015-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S16
S13 (Similar To) 2015-02-17 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H67 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
S962 (Similar To) 2015-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2034
S730 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1285 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1148 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S53 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - No further action
S1570 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S774 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1233 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback