MA S78 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4613
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create and authorize level iv behavioral treatment interventions. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to level IV treatment interventions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4613 |
2015-07-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H4613 (Replaced by) 2016-09-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S49 (Similar To) 2015-04-15 - See S44
S28 (Similar To) 2015-03-19 - Text of S21, printed as amended
S585 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1051 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1030 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H520 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied S352
S49 (Similar To) 2015-04-15 - See S44
S28 (Similar To) 2015-03-19 - Text of S21, printed as amended
S585 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1051 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1030 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H520 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied S352
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S78 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S78.pdf |