MA S2270 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S103
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the office of the child advocate,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2270).
Title
Relative to the office of the child advocate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-05-02 | Senate | New draft of S103 |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S103 (Replaces) 2016-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2270
S1240 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S760 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1122 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied S1123
H1649 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
S1240 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S760 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1122 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied S1123
H1649 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2270 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2270.pdf |