MA H3647 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4613
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Malia of Boston (by request), a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Ron Goldman to encourage parents and caregivers of children to refrain from the use of corporal punishment. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Resolutions to encourage parents and caregivers of children to refrain from the use of corporal punishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4613 |
2015-10-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-07-02 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
2015-03-25 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4613 (Replaced by) 2016-09-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1804 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H2009 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1805 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H3038 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4470
H526 (Similar To) 2016-07-25 - New draft substituted, see H4535
H1804 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H2009 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1805 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H3038 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4470
H526 (Similar To) 2016-07-25 - New draft substituted, see H4535
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3647 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3647.pdf |