MA H3906 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4331
Note: Legislation replaced by H3905
Note: Legislation replaced by H3905
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on December 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4331
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4331
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to modernizing municipal finance and government [for message, see House, No. 3905] as relates to sections 15 through 30, 36 through 41, 48 through 55, 57 through 79, 81 through 94, 96 through 100, 201 through 220, 232 through 240. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
To modernize municipal finance and government
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4331 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-04-21 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday, May 16, 2016, pending concurrence |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, April 15, 2016, pending concurrence |
2016-01-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/09/2016 from 01:30 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-12-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-12-17 | House | Sections 15-30, 36-41, 48-55, 57-79, 81-94, 96-100, 201-220 and 232-240 referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
2015-12-17 | House | For message, see H3905 |
Same As/Similar To
H4331 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - New draft substituted, see H4397
H3905 (Replaced by) 2015-12-17 - Placed on file
S1 (Similar To) 2015-01-08 - Placed on file
H49 (Similar To) 2015-02-11 - Reported, in part, by H52
H55 (Similar To) 2015-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2015
H59 (Similar To) 2016-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2015
H60 (Similar To) 2015-03-26 - Reported, in part, by H3203
H4756 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 393 of the Acts of 2016
H4755 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - See H2319
H3905 (Replaced by) 2015-12-17 - Placed on file
S1 (Similar To) 2015-01-08 - Placed on file
H49 (Similar To) 2015-02-11 - Reported, in part, by H52
H55 (Similar To) 2015-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2015
H59 (Similar To) 2016-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2015
H60 (Similar To) 2015-03-26 - Reported, in part, by H3203
H4756 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 393 of the Acts of 2016
H4755 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - See H2319
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3906 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3906.pdf |