MA S2188 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to partition fences. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to partition fences
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2016-04-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/12/2016 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2016-03-21 | House | House concurred |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S991 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S1163 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1565 (Similar To) 2015-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3639
H352 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4601
S993 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S932 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S713 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S1163 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1565 (Similar To) 2015-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3639
H352 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4601
S993 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S932 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S713 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2188 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2188.pdf |