MA S1668 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2386
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the leasing of Ponkapoag Golf Course. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To authorize the leasing of the Ponkapoag Golf Course
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Joyce [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2386 |
2015-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/06/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2386 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1588 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1494 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1666 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1583 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1492 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S2306 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1588 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1494 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1666 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1583 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1492 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S2306 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1668 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1668.pdf |