MA S1494 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2290

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to increase the property tax deferral for seniors. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing the property tax deferral for seniors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-07HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2016-07-07HouseRules suspended
2016-07-07HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2016-06-20HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2016-06-16SenatePassed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #368 (Yeas 36 to Nays 0)
2016-06-16SenateRead third
2016-06-16SenateRules suspended
2016-06-16SenateOrdered to a third reading
2016-06-16SenateAmendment #2 (Donnelly) adopted -see Roll Call #367 (Yeas 35 to Nays 0)
2016-06-16SenateAmendment #1 (Tarr) adopted -see Roll Call #366 (Yeas 35 to Nays 0)
2016-06-16SenateRead second
2016-06-09SenateCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday June 16, 2016
2016-06-09SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2016-05-12SenateDischarged from a part of S2290 to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2016-05-12SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2290
2015-07-16JointHearing scheduled for 07/28/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S2290 (Replaced by) 2016-05-12 - Reported in part by S1494
S1495 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1459 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Accompanied H2587
S1342 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1460 (Similar To) 2015-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1958
S1562 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4235
S362 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2316
S371 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1555 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1557 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1611 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1550 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1447 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback