MA S1670 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2386
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Massachusetts Economic and Financial Advisory Council. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Establishing the Massachusetts Economic and Financial Advisory Council
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2386 |
2015-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2386 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S676 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2099
H163 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H135 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H224 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
S244 (Similar To) 2016-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2134
S676 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2099
H163 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H135 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H224 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
S244 (Similar To) 2016-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2134
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1670 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1670.pdf |