MA S607 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2356

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to Health Policy Commission oversight of insurer transactions. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to Health Policy Commission oversight of insurer transactions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-23SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2356
2015-05-29JointHearing scheduled for 06/03/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

S2356 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S510 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S572 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
H1036 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied S570
S553 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S470 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
H1059 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4228
H2815 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback