MA S203 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2247

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2247
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to investigators at the Alcoholic Beverages Control Commission. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to investigators at the Alcoholic Beverages Control Commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-28SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2247
2015-10-06JointHearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

S2247 (Replaced by) 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1442 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
S196 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S159 (Similar To) 2015-12-03 - Accompanied H199
S1851 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback