MA S1851 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2364

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation explore alternative funding sources to ensure safe and reliable transportation. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To explore alternative funding sources to ensure safe and reliable transportation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-23SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2364
2016-02-17JointHearing scheduled for 02/24/2016 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

S2364 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1515 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
H3091 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Senate concurred
S233 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1878 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1877 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S288 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2331
S1282 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Accompanied H2161
S246 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
S1844 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1697 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S2123 (Similar To) 2016-01-28 - Placed on file
S2341 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1597 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1725 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1218 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2149
S1755 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S1036 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback