MA H3091 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-07 - Senate concurred
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-07 - Senate concurred
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate motorcycle sound levels. Transportation.
Title
To further regulate motorcycle exhaust sound levels
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-04-04 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-11-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3093 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2416 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H534 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4155
H956 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4198
H3092 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H4754 (Similar To) 2017-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 356 of the Acts of 2016
H4760 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2416 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H534 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4155
H956 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4198
H3092 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H4754 (Similar To) 2017-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 356 of the Acts of 2016
H4760 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3091 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3091.pdf |