MA S1559 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2290

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to sales tax relief in the aftermath of an emergency. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to sales tax relief in the aftermath of an emergency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-12SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2290
2015-07-07JointHearing scheduled for 07/21/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S2290 (Replaced by) 2016-05-12 - Reported in part by S1494
S137 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S1259 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1447 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1223 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1491 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback