MA S1223 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2199

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to prohibit the use of bisphenol-A in consumer products. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the use of bisphenol-A in consumer products

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-28SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2199
2015-09-10JointHearing scheduled for 09/17/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S2199 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S1231
S732 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2152
S834 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4107
S96 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2306
S1200 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S686 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S31 (Similar To) 2016-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 143 of the Acts of 2016
S20 (Similar To) 2015-04-02 - Read second, amended and ordered to a third reading
S38 (Similar To) 2015-06-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3077 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback