MA S31 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 143 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a special fund for recaptured funds from rehabilitation or receivership property liens or related grants in the town of Athol. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the town of Athol to establish a special fund for the rehabilitation of certain properties

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-14 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 143 of the Acts of 2016
2016-07-07SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2016-07-07HouseEnacted
2016-07-07SenateSenate concurred in the House amendment
2016-07-07SenateRules suspended
2016-05-16HouseRead third, amended and passed to be engrossed
2016-02-04HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2016-02-04HouseRules suspended
2016-02-04HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2016-01-06HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2016-01-04SenateRead third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2016-01-04SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2015-07-29SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2015-05-18SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2015-05-06JointHearing scheduled for 05/12/2015 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in 428
2015-05-04HouseHearing on 05/12/2015 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in 428 cancelled
2015-03-30HouseHouse concurred
2015-03-26SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

S1833 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S32 (Similar To) 2016-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 144 of the Acts of 2016
S1967 (Similar To) 2016-12-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S676 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2099
S628 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1089 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Accompanied H1831
S951 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S129 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1525 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S459 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1453 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S484 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1041 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback