MA S1525 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2290

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide tax credits for hospitals providing charitable care. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing tax credits for hospitals providing charitable care

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-12SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2290
2015-08-26JointHearing scheduled for 09/22/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S2290 (Replaced by) 2016-05-12 - Reported in part by S1494
S1376 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S624 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S623 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S546 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1146 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1562 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4235
S1522 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback