OK HB1859 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1859
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-29 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-29 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; drivers license; class requirements; printing; credentials; fees for expedited delivery; emergency.
Title
Motor vehicles; drivers license; class requirements; printing; credentials; fees for expedited delivery; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | SA's received |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Title restored |
2024-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-12 | House | General Order |
2024-02-29 | House | Emergency added |
2024-02-29 | House | Title stricken |
2024-02-29 | House | Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-29 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Alonso-Sandoval |
2024-02-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-02-27 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-07 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Kerbs |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1859 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - Second Reading referred to Rules