IL HB0611 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Use Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REVENUE-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2024-04-19HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2024-04-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2024-04-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2024-04-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
2024-04-15HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
2024-04-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2024-04-15HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2023-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-03-21HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2023-03-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2023-03-01HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2023-02-23HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2023-01-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-01-12HouseFirst Reading
2022-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
351051Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback