MA S732 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2152

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2152
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to requiring child-resistant packaging of nicotine liquid containers. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring child-resistant packaging of nicotine liquid containers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-03SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2152
2015-07-14JointHearing rescheduled to 07/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-07-07JointHearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2015-06-22HouseHouse concurred
2015-06-18SenateDischarged to the Joint Committee on Public Health
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S2152 (Replaced by) 2016-04-28 - New draft substituted, see S2234
S1223 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S834 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4107
S96 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2306
S686 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S31 (Similar To) 2016-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 143 of the Acts of 2016
S38 (Similar To) 2015-06-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S20 (Similar To) 2015-04-02 - Read second, amended and ordered to a third reading
H3077 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback