MA S20 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Read second, amended and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the special election in the city known as the town of Greenfield. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the special election in the city known as the town of Greenfield

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-02HouseRead second, amended and ordered to a third reading
2015-04-02HouseRules suspended
2015-04-02HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2015-03-23HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2015-03-19SenateRead second, amended (Kennedy), ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2015-03-19SenateRules suspended
2015-03-19SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass
2015-03-11HouseHouse concurred
2015-03-09SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

S1883 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2430 (Similar To) 2016-07-13 - See H4419
S2426 (Similar To) 2016-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2016
S2451 (Similar To) 2016-07-30 - Read; and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S2480 (Similar To) 2016-10-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 290 of the Acts of 2016

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback