MA S2426 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve to establish a special commission to consider an appropriate tribute to Nelson Mandela in the City of Boston
Title
Resolve to establish a special commission to consider an appropriate tribute to Nelson Mandela in the City of Boston
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-02 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2016 | |
2016-07-23 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2016-07-23 | Senate | Resolve passed |
2016-07-23 | House | Resolve passed |
2016-07-21 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-21 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-07-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-07-21 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-07-14 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Substituted for H2929 |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Recommended new draft (Lewis) for H2929 |
Same As/Similar To
S605 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1675 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S302 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
S217 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S1508 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1675 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S302 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
S217 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S1508 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2426 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2426.pdf |