MA S1675 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a special commission to identify opportunities to improve the efficiency and effectiveness of state agencies, programs, and services. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a special commission to identify opportunities to improve the efficiency and effectiveness of state agencies, programs, and services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-21SenateDischarged to the committee on Senate Rules
2016-04-19SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
2015-10-23JointHearing scheduled for 10/27/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

H2850 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S607 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1708 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
H513 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S79 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1714 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1357 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1057 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S203 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2247
S1187 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S493 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1851 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
S1559 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback