MA S1057 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to local disability commission expansion. Municipalities and Regional Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to local disability commission expansion

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2015-11-05JointHearing scheduled for 11/12/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

S1458 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1985 (Similar To) -
H2284 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
S1408 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1337 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
H2306 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Accompanied H3492
S1043 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S1349 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S445 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1315 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback