MA S493 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to motor vehicle service contracts. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to motor vehicle service contracts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-07SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2015-07-01JointHearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S1858 (Similar To) 2015-10-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2032
S536 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2232
S830 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S2032 (Similar To) 2016-01-21 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2093
S2093 (Similar To) 2016-01-21 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
S460 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2108
S454 (Similar To) 2016-06-28 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2308
S1759 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2274
H2737 (Similar To) 2015-07-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1970
H2562 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback