MA S96 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2306

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the well being of children. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the well being of children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-02SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2306
2016-04-25SenateBill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2016-01-28JointHearing scheduled for 02/09/2016 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

S2306 (Replaced by) 2016-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3148 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4084
S75 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - New draft substituted, see S2043
S676 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2099
S101 (Similar To) 2015-10-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S556 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S847 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2361
S404 (Similar To) 2016-02-22 - Accompanied S452
S1373 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S262 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2288

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback