MA S556 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2318
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to make habilitative services available to the children of the Commonwealth. Financial Services.
Title
To make habilitative services available to the children of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2318 |
2015-10-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S2318 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S101 (Similar To) 2015-10-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1373 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S400 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4167
S494 (Similar To) 2016-06-27 - New draft substituted, see S2378
S797 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S75 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - New draft substituted, see S2043
S676 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2099
H1009 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
S82 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2382
S88 (Similar To) 2016-05-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S66 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2306
S72 (Similar To) 2015-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S73 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S101 (Similar To) 2015-10-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1373 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S400 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4167
S494 (Similar To) 2016-06-27 - New draft substituted, see S2378
S797 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S75 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - New draft substituted, see S2043
S676 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2099
H1009 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
S82 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2382
S88 (Similar To) 2016-05-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S66 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2306
S72 (Similar To) 2015-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S73 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S556 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S556.pdf |