MA H3148 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4084
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4084
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4084
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Board of Higher Education to offer and administer free online public higher education courses to veterans. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to the education of the veterans of Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4084 |
2015-10-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2015 from 02:00 PM-05:30 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H4084 (Replaced by) 2016-03-16 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1512 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1513 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3051 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2640 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4213
H2161 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1512 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1513 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3051 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2640 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4213
H2161 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3148 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3148.pdf |