MA S262 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2288

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2288
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to language opportunity for our kids. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

For language opportunity for our kids

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-12SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2288
2016-04-28SenateSenate concurred
2016-04-21HouseReporting date extended to Friday, May 6, 2016, pending concurrence
2016-03-16SenateSenate concurred
2016-03-16HouseReporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2016, pending concurrence
2015-05-07JointHearing scheduled for 05/12/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

S2288 (Replaced by) 2016-07-07 - New draft substituted, see S2395
S67 (Similar To) 2015-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S264 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
S265 (Similar To) 2015-09-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2013
S260 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2347
S223 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S302 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
S668 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S255 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
S1853 (Similar To) 2015-07-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S565 (Similar To) 2016-05-25 - Accompanied H1024
S575 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1366 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1312 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1903 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S250 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S208 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read and referred to the Joint Committee on Ways and Means
S1379 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback