MA S565 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H1024
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-25 - Accompanied H1024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-25 - Accompanied H1024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to physician assistants. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to physician assistants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | House | Accompanied H1024 |
2015-09-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/22/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H1024 (Replaced by) 2016-06-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1036 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied S570
H1058 (Similar To) 2016-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3955
S500 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S570 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S484 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1009 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H1036 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied S570
H1058 (Similar To) 2016-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3955
S500 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S570 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S484 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1009 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S565 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S565.pdf |