MA S1009 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4605
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To promote employer sponsorship of health care
Title
To promote employer sponsorship of health care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4605 |
2015-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/22/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H4605 (Replaced by) 2016-09-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S643 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1382 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S570 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S529 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S568 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S628 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1188 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S226 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S493 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1327 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S491 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S528 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1487 (Similar To) 2015-05-07 - Accompanied H2517
S643 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1382 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S570 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S529 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S568 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S628 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1188 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S226 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S493 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1327 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S491 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S528 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1487 (Similar To) 2015-05-07 - Accompanied H2517
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1009 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1009.pdf |